AR SB586 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that SB586 is now Act 1109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that SB586 is now Act 1109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring A Person Convicted Of An Offense Using A Computer Or The Internet To Pay An Additional Fee; And To Create A Fee.
Title
Requiring A Person Convicted Of An Offense Using A Computer Or The Internet To Pay An Additional Fee; And To Create A Fee.
Sponsors
Sen. Bart Hester [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Notification that SB586 is now Act 1109 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-04-03 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-04-03 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-23 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Filed |