AR SB584 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Notification that SB584 is now Act 774
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Require The Department Of Finance And Administration To Provide Space On Income Tax Forms For An Individual Taxpayer To Designate More Than One (1) Account For The Direct Deposit Of The Taxpayer's Refund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require The Department Of Finance And Administration To Provide Space On Income Tax Forms For An Individual Taxpayer To Designate More Than One (1) Account For The Direct Deposit Of The Taxpayer's Refund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateNotification that SB584 is now Act 774
2019-04-03SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-03SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-02SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-02SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-04-02HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-04-02HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-28HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2019-03-26HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-26SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-26SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-25SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-25SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-25SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-20SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-18SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2019-03-18SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback