AR SB582 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Notification that SB582 is now Act 772
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Notification that SB582 is now Act 772
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide A Sales And Use Tax Refund For Machinery And Equipment Used To Modify, Replace, Or Repair Molds And Dies Used In Manufacturing.
Title
To Provide A Sales And Use Tax Refund For Machinery And Equipment Used To Modify, Replace, Or Repair Molds And Dies Used In Manufacturing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Notification that SB582 is now Act 772 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-04-02 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2019-03-25 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Filed |