AR SB579 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Require The Disclosure Of All Evidence In The Possession Of The State To A Criminal Defendant, Whether The Evidence Is Inculpatory, Exculpatory, Or Neither Inculpatory Nor Exculpatory.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require The Disclosure Of All Evidence In The Possession Of The State To A Criminal Defendant, Whether The Evidence Is Inculpatory, Exculpatory, Or Neither Inculpatory Nor Exculpatory.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateRecommended for study in the Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-04-24SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-24SenateDied in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2019-04-24SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-24HouseReturned to the Senate.
2019-04-24HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
2019-04-01HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-04-01HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-04-01SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-04-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-28SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-18SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-15SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback