AR SB570 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Expire The Terms Of The Current Membership Of The Arkansas State Medical Board; And To Amend The Membership Of The Arkansas State Medical Board.
Title
To Expire The Terms Of The Current Membership Of The Arkansas State Medical Board; And To Amend The Membership Of The Arkansas State Medical Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Motion to Expunge the vote by which SB570 failed to pass. Roll call on the motion. (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | The vote by which SB570 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the vote by which SB570 failed to pass. Roll call on the motion. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-30 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Filed |