AR SB57 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Notification that SB57 is now Act 528
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Notification that SB57 is now Act 528
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Developmental Disabilities Services Appropriation For The 2021-2022 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Developmental Disabilities Services Appropriation For The 2021-2022 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Senate | Notification that SB57 is now Act 528 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-23 | House | Returned To Senate as Passed. |
2021-03-23 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-23 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-23 | House | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2021-03-23 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2021-03-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2021-03-22 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2021-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Filed |