AR SB57 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Notification that SB57 is now Act 608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Notification that SB57 is now Act 608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Use Of A Victim Impact Statement During An Inmate's Parole Determination.
Title
Concerning The Use Of A Victim Impact Statement During An Inmate's Parole Determination.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | Senate | Notification that SB57 is now Act 608 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-17 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-12 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-02 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Filed |