AR SB57 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-04 - Notification that SB57 is now Act 172
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-04 - Notification that SB57 is now Act 172
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding The Sex Offender Registration Act Of 1997 And Regarding The Requirements Of Registering As A Sex Offender.
Title
Regarding The Sex Offender Registration Act Of 1997 And Regarding The Requirements Of Registering As A Sex Offender.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Woods [R] | Rep. Micah Neal [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | Senate | Notification that SB57 is now Act 172 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2013-02-19 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-02-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-15 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-14 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-02-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-07 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Filed |