AR SB569 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that SB569 is now Act 1050
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that SB569 is now Act 1050
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Health And Safety Of Public School Students.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Health And Safety Of Public School Students.
Sponsors
Sen. Bart Hester [R] | Rep. Stan Berry [R] | Rep. Lee Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Notification that SB569 is now Act 1050 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1. |
2021-04-26 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-04-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-26 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-26 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-22 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-04-19 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-19 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Filed |