AR SB568 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Economic Security Report Prepared By The Department Of Workforce Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Economic Security Report Prepared By The Department Of Workforce Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateSine Die adjournment
2017-05-01SenateDied in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2017-03-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2017-03-09HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2017-03-09SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2017-03-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-08SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-03-02SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
2017-03-02SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback