AR SB565 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Notification that SB565 is now Act 970
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Health Professional Demographic Data Report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Health Professional Demographic Data Report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06SenateNotification that SB565 is now Act 970
2017-03-30SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2017-03-30SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2017-03-30SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2017-03-30SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2017-03-29HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2017-03-29HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-03-27HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-03-23HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2017-03-22HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2017-03-22SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2017-03-22SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-21SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-03-02SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2017-03-02SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback