AR SB561 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Notification that SB561 is now Act 819
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Arkansas Tax Reform Act Of 2019; And To Reform The Sales Tax, Income Tax, Property Tax, And Franchise Tax Laws Of The State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Arkansas Tax Reform Act Of 2019; And To Reform The Sales Tax, Income Tax, Property Tax, And Franchise Tax Laws Of The State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 77 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateNotification that SB561 is now Act 819
2019-04-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-05SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-04SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-04SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-04SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-03SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2019-04-01SenateRe-referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2019-04-01SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-28HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-03-28HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-27HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-27HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-27HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-26HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2019-03-20HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-20SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-20SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-19SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-19SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-19SenateRules suspended.
2019-03-19SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-19SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-18SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-13SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2019-03-13SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback