AR SB561 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-06 - Notification that SB561 is now Act 834
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Community Based Program Grants General Improvement Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Community Based Program Grants General Improvement Appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-06SenateNotification that SB561 is now Act 834
2013-04-03SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-03SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-02SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-02SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-02HouseReturned To Senate as Passed.
2013-04-02HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-02HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-02HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-04-02HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2013-03-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2013-03-25HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-03-25SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-03-25SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-03-25SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-03-25SenateRules suspended.
2013-03-25SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-03-21SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-02-27SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-02-27SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback