AR SB560 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend The Administration Of State Taxes; To Amend The Administrative Hearing Procedures For State Taxes; To Create The Tax Appeals Commission Act; And To Create A Fund For The Tax Appeals Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Administration Of State Taxes; To Amend The Administrative Hearing Procedures For State Taxes; To Create The Tax Appeals Commission Act; And To Create A Fund For The Tax Appeals Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-10SenateRecommended for study in the Interim Committee on REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2019-04-10SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-10SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-10SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-10SenateThe vote by which SB560 Passed was expunged.
2019-04-10SenateMotion to Expunge the Vote
2019-04-09SenateReturned From the House as requested.
2019-04-09HouseReturned To the Senate as requested.
2019-03-25HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2019-03-25HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-25SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-25SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-20SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-13SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2019-03-13SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback