AR SB557 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Notification that SB557 is now Act 818
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Designate Washington, Arkansas, As The Birthplace Of The Bowie Knife, Arkansas Heritage Site.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Designate Washington, Arkansas, As The Birthplace Of The Bowie Knife, Arkansas Heritage Site.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateNotification that SB557 is now Act 818
2019-04-04SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-04SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-03SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-03SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-03SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-03SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-02SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2019-04-01SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-04-01SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2019-04-01HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-04-01HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-28HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-28HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-28HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-27HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-03-20HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-20SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-20SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-19SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-13SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-13SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback