AR SB555 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Notification that SB555 is now Act 937
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Notification that SB555 is now Act 937
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Modify Incentive Bonuses For National Board For Professional Teaching Standards Certification.
Title
To Modify Incentive Bonuses For National Board For Professional Teaching Standards Certification.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Notification that SB555 is now Act 937 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 & 2 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 & 2. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2 |
2017-03-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-27 | House | Amendment No. 1 & 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 & 2 |
2017-03-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-20 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The vote by which SB 555 FAILED of adoption was EXPUNGED. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Filed |