AR SB550 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Regarding Liquid Livestock Litter Utilization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Regarding Liquid Livestock Litter Utilization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-24SenateDied in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2019-04-24SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-24HouseReturned to the Senate.
2019-04-24HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
2019-03-26HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-26HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-26HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2019-03-19HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-19SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-18SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-18SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-18SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-14SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-12SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE
2019-03-12SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback