AR SB544 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Notification that SB544 is now Act 1110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Notification that SB544 is now Act 1110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring A Person In The Custody Of A Correctional Facility To Use Funds From Federal Relief Or Stimulus Programs To First Pay Outstanding Fines, Fees, Costs, Or Restitution; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
Requiring A Person In The Custody Of A Correctional Facility To Use Funds From Federal Relief Or Stimulus Programs To First Pay Outstanding Fines, Fees, Costs, Or Restitution; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Notification that SB544 is now Act 1110 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-26 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1,2 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 and Amendment #2. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed, as amended, Amendment #1 and #2 |
2021-04-21 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2 |
2021-04-21 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-21 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-21 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2021-04-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-13 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-05 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Filed |