AR SB544 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB544 is now Act 995
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish Prejudgment And Post-judgment Interest Rates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish Prejudgment And Post-judgment Interest Rates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateNotification that SB544 is now Act 995
2019-04-10SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-10SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-09SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-09SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-09SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-04SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2019-04-04HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-04-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-03HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-03HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-04-03HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-04-02HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-20HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-20SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-20SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-19SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-12SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-12SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback