AR SB543 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Clarify The Uniform Contribution Among Tortfeasors Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Clarify The Uniform Contribution Among Tortfeasors Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-24SenateDied in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2019-04-24SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-24HouseReturned to the Senate.
2019-04-24HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
2019-03-27HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-27HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-27SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-26SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-26SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-25SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
2019-03-12SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-12SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback