AR SB542 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Notification that SB542 is now Act 1242
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Notification that SB542 is now Act 1242
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify The Penalties For Making False Statements In Applications For Unemployment Benefits; And To Require The Department Of Workforce Services To Track False Statements And To Report To The Legislative Council.
Title
To Clarify The Penalties For Making False Statements In Applications For Unemployment Benefits; And To Require The Department Of Workforce Services To Track False Statements And To Report To The Legislative Council.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | Senate | Notification that SB542 is now Act 1242 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-04-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-03 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-03 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-03-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-25 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Filed |