AR SB540 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Specify Terms Regarding Termination And Buyout Agreements That A Contract Of Employment For A Public School District Superintendent Shall Include.
Title
To Specify Terms Regarding Termination And Buyout Agreements That A Contract Of Employment For A Public School District Superintendent Shall Include.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-04-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-21 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Filed |