AR SB530 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Certain Provisions Of The Workers' Compensation Law That Resulted From Initiated Act No. 4 Of 1948; To Revise Third-party Liability In The Workers' Compensation Law; And To Modify The Process For Requesting A Hearing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Certain Provisions Of The Workers' Compensation Law That Resulted From Initiated Act No. 4 Of 1948; To Revise Third-party Liability In The Workers' Compensation Law; And To Modify The Process For Requesting A Hearing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-15SenateSine Die adjournment
2021-04-07SenateWithdrawn by author.
2021-04-07SenateWithdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
2021-04-05SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-29SenateEXPUNGED
2021-03-29SenateRead the third time and failed.
2021-03-22SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-15SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback