AR SB528 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that SB528 is now Act 776
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that SB528 is now Act 776
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For The Disclosure Of Limited Information On Certain Credits And Rebates Of Sales And Use Tax To Impacted Local Governments.
Title
To Provide For The Disclosure Of Limited Information On Certain Credits And Rebates Of Sales And Use Tax To Impacted Local Governments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Notification that SB528 is now Act 776 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-15 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2021-04-05 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |