AR SB526 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Require The Presence Of A Financial Counselor Under Certain Conditions When A Student Of A State-supported Institution Of Higher Education Signs A Document To Borrow A Student Education Loan.
Title
To Require The Presence Of A Financial Counselor Under Certain Conditions When A Student Of A State-supported Institution Of Higher Education Signs A Document To Borrow A Student Education Loan.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - Motion to expunge SB526 vote fails (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Returned From the House as Failed to Pass |
2019-04-24 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2019-04-24 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion to expunge SB526 vote fails |
2019-04-03 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-04-02 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-04-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-04-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Filed |