AR SB525 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB525 is now Act 889
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Modernize Plumbing Plan Review Submissions And Responses; And To Clarify That Local Jurisdiction Review Of Certain Plumbing Plans And Specifications Does Not Require Review By The Department Of Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Modernize Plumbing Plan Review Submissions And Responses; And To Clarify That Local Jurisdiction Review Of Certain Plumbing Plans And Specifications Does Not Require Review By The Department Of Health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateNotification that SB525 is now Act 889
2019-04-08SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-08SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-05SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-05SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-04-05HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-04-05HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-04HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-04-02HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-04-02HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-04-02SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-04-02SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-01SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-01SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-01SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-28SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback