AR SB518 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that SB518 is now Act 1070
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that SB518 is now Act 1070
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Membership Of The Professional Licensure Standards Board.
Title
To Amend The Membership Of The Professional Licensure Standards Board.
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Key [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | Senate | Notification that SB518 is now Act 1070 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-26 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-21 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Filed |