AR SB512 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Notification that SB512 is now Act 736
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Provide For The Assignment Of Benefits To A Healthcare Provider.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Provide For The Assignment Of Benefits To A Healthcare Provider.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateNotification that SB512 is now Act 736
2019-04-03SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-03SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-02SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-02SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-04-02HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-04-02HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-29HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-27HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2019-03-27HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-27SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-26SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-20SenateRe-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-03-20SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-20SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-20SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2019-03-13SenateRe-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-03-13SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-13SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-13SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-03-06SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-03-06SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback