AR SB510 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Suburban Improvement Districts.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Suburban Improvement Districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The vote by which SB510 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the Vote by which SB510 failed to pass |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |