AR SB5 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Notification that SB5 is now Act 5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Notification that SB5 is now Act 5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning The Time For The General Assembly To Meet In Fiscal Session.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning The Time For The General Assembly To Meet In Fiscal Session.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 72 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Motion was made by Senator Dismang to suspend the rules to place SB5 on the Calendar. Motion FAILED. (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Motion to extract SB5 from the Senate Committee on State Agencies carried. Bill was extracted from the State Agencies Committee. (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Motion was made by Senator Dismang to suspend the rules to place SB5 on the Calendar. Motion FAILED. (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Motion to extract SB5 from the Senate Committee on State Agencies carried. Bill was extracted from the State Agencies Committee. (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Senate | Notification that SB5 is now Act 5 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-05-28 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-05-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-05-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-05-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2015-05-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-05-27 | Senate | EXPUNGED |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Motion was made by Senator Dismang to suspend the rules to place SB5 on the Calendar. Motion FAILED. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Motion to extract SB5 from the Senate Committee on State Agencies carried. Bill was extracted from the State Agencies Committee. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Filed |