AR SB5 | 2014 | 89th General Assembly 2nd Special

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Notification that SB5 is now Act 8
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Restrict The Use Of Multidraw Screen-based Lottery Games For The Arkansas Scholarship Lottery And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Restrict The Use Of Multidraw Screen-based Lottery Games For The Arkansas Scholarship Lottery And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-07-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-10SenateNotification that SB5 is now Act 8
2014-07-02SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2014-07-02SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2014-07-02SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2014-07-02SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2014-07-02HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2014-07-02HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2014-07-02HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2014-07-01HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2014-07-01HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2014-07-01HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2014-07-01SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2014-07-01SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2014-07-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2014-07-01SenateRules suspended.
2014-07-01SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2014-06-30SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2014-06-30SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback