AR SB499 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Require Farmers' Markets To Identify The Production Location Of Food Sold At Farmers' Markets.
Title
To Require Farmers' Markets To Identify The Production Location Of Food Sold At Farmers' Markets.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Filed |