AR SB498 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 62-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Notification that SB498 is now Act 952
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 62-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Notification that SB498 is now Act 952
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Arkansas Law Concerning The Enforcement Of Election Laws.
Title
To Amend The Arkansas Law Concerning The Enforcement Of Election Laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 9 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Notification that SB498 is now Act 952 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-14 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-04-07 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Filed |