AR SB49 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Notification that SB49 is now Act 1199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Notification that SB49 is now Act 1199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Enact The Arkansas Teen Driver And Parental Education Act Of 2015.
Title
To Enact The Arkansas Teen Driver And Parental Education Act Of 2015.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] | Sen. James Sturch [R] | Sen. Blake Johnson [R] | Sen. Linda Collins-Smith [R] |
Sen. David Sanders [R] | Sen. Scott Flippo [R] | Sen. Gary Stubblefield [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | Senate | Notification that SB49 is now Act 1199 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2015-03-26 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2015-03-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-25 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-25 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-24 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2015-03-23 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2015-03-23 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2015-01-29 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Amendment #1 Withdrawn. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Filed |