AR SB487 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 62-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Notification that SB487 is now Act 729
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Establishment And Alteration Of Precinct Boundaries, Polling Sites, And Vote Centers; And To Amend Arkansas Election Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Establishment And Alteration Of Precinct Boundaries, Polling Sites, And Vote Centers; And To Amend Arkansas Election Law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19SenateNotification that SB487 is now Act 729
2021-04-14SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-14SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-13SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-13SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-04-13HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-04-13HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-12HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-04-01HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2021-04-01HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-04-01SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-04-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-31SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-08SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2021-03-05SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback