AR SB485 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB485 is now Act 885
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Arkansas Department Of Environmental Quality Infrastructure Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Arkansas Department Of Environmental Quality Infrastructure Appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateNotification that SB485 is now Act 885
2019-04-09SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-09SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-08SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-08SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-04-08HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-04-08HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-08HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-05HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2019-04-05HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-04-05SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-04-05SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-04SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-03SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-03-04SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback