AR SB482 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Returned to the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Create An Income Tax Credit For The Purchase Of An Electric Vehicle Or A Hybrid Vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create An Income Tax Credit For The Purchase Of An Electric Vehicle Or A Hybrid Vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseReturned to the Senate.
2019-04-24HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
2019-03-28HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2019-03-28HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-28SenateCLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
2019-03-28SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-25SenateThe vote by which SB482 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2019-03-25SenateMotion to Expunge the Vote
2019-03-25SenateRead the third time and failed.
2019-03-20SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-18SenateRe-referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2019-03-18SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-18SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-18SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-03-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2019-03-04SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback