AR SB481 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Retail Water Providers And Related Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Retail Water Providers And Related Service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateRecommended for study in the Interim Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-04-24SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-24SenateDied on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
2019-04-24SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-24HouseReturned to the Senate.
2019-04-24HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
2019-04-09HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-09HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-04-09HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-04-08HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2019-04-08HouseRe-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-04-08HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-08HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-04-08HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-04-05HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-27HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-27HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-27SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-26SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-20SenateRe-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-20SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-20SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-20SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-03-18SenateRe-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-12SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-04SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback