AR SB48 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-14 - Notification that SB48 is now Act 47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-14 - Notification that SB48 is now Act 47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The "good Samaritan" Law To Include To Certain Persons And Nonprofit Organization Who Provide Suicide Prevention Interventions.
Title
To Amend The "good Samaritan" Law To Include To Certain Persons And Nonprofit Organization Who Provide Suicide Prevention Interventions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | Senate | Notification that SB48 is now Act 47 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2023-02-06 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2023-02-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-02 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-01-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-01-26 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Filed |