AR SB479 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Notification that SB479 is now Act 733
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Authorize And Require The Issuance Of A Title For A Watercraft; And To Create The Arkansas Motorboat Registration And Titling Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Authorize And Require The Issuance Of A Title For A Watercraft; And To Create The Arkansas Motorboat Registration And Titling Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 71 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 15 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateNotification that SB479 is now Act 733
2019-04-03SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-03SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-02SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-02SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-04-02HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-04-02HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-28HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2019-03-26HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-26SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-26SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-25SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-25SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-25SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-20SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
2019-03-14SenateRe-referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2019-03-14SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-14SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-14SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-03-13SenateRe-referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2019-03-12SenateThe vote by which SB479 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2019-03-12SenateEXPUNGED
2019-03-12SenateMotion to Expunge the vote by which SB 479 failed to pass.
2019-03-12SenateRead the third time and failed.
2019-03-11SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2019-03-04SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback