AR SB476 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Eviction Proceedings; To Allow The Court To Seal Certain Court Records; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Eviction Proceedings; To Allow The Court To Seal Certain Court Records; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 48 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-04-27 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-04-27 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-22 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | The vote by which SB476 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the Vote by which SB476 failed to pass. Motion passed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Filed |