AR SB474 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Notification that SB474 is now Act 609
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Criminal Offenses Of Fertility Treatment Abuse And Fertility Treatment Fraud; And To Create The Civil Action Of Civil Fertility Fraud.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Criminal Offenses Of Fertility Treatment Abuse And Fertility Treatment Fraud; And To Create The Civil Action Of Civil Fertility Fraud.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateNotification that SB474 is now Act 609
2021-04-07SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-07SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-06SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-06SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-04-06HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-04-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-01HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-18HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-03-18SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-03-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-17SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-16SenateRe-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-16SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-16SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-16SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-03-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-04SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback