AR SB470 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Notification that SB470 is now Act 555
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Notification that SB470 is now Act 555
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish The Online Marketplace Consumer Inform Act; To Require The Disclosure Of Information By Online Marketplaces To Better Inform Consumers; To Regulate Online Marketplaces To Stop Organized Retail Crime.
Title
To Establish The Online Marketplace Consumer Inform Act; To Require The Disclosure Of Information By Online Marketplaces To Better Inform Consumers; To Regulate Online Marketplaces To Stop Organized Retail Crime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 15 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Senate | Notification that SB470 is now Act 555 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-29 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-29 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-17 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2021-03-17 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Filed |