AR SB459 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Notification that SB459 is now Act 732
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Arkansas Natural Resources Commission - Feral Hog Eradication Expenses Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Arkansas Natural Resources Commission - Feral Hog Eradication Expenses Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateNotification that SB459 is now Act 732
2019-04-02SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-01SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-01SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-01SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-29HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-29HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-29HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-28HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2019-03-28HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-28SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-28SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-26SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-19SenateRe-referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-03-19SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-19SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-19SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-02-28SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2019-02-28SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback