AR SB458 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Notification that SB458 is now Act 702
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Transfer The Arkansas Wireless Information Network To The Arkansas Department Of Emergency Management; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Transfer The Arkansas Wireless Information Network To The Arkansas Department Of Emergency Management; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateNotification that SB458 is now Act 702
2019-04-02SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-01SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-01SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-01SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-28HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-28HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-28HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-27HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-03-18HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-18SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-18SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-14SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-05SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-05SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-05SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-05SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-02-28SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-02-28SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback