AR SB455 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Certain Fees, Expenses, And Other Costs Imposed On A Juvenile Or The Parent, Guardian, Or Custodian Of A Juvenile.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Certain Fees, Expenses, And Other Costs Imposed On A Juvenile Or The Parent, Guardian, Or Custodian Of A Juvenile.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-23 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Filed |