AR SB454 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB454 is now Act 882
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Investment Of Funds In The State Treasury; And To Amend The Powers And Duties Of The State Board Of Finance In Relation To The Chief Investment Officer Of The Treasurer Of State's Office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Investment Of Funds In The State Treasury; And To Amend The Powers And Duties Of The State Board Of Finance In Relation To The Chief Investment Officer Of The Treasurer Of State's Office.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateNotification that SB454 is now Act 882
2019-04-08SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-08SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-05SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-05SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-04-05HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-04-05HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-20HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2019-03-18HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-18SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-14SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-28SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-02-28SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback