AR SB452 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Require That Apportionment Of Wards Be Conducted By The County Boards Of Election Commissioners; And To Amend The Law Concerning Designation Of Wards In Municipalities.
Title
To Require That Apportionment Of Wards Be Conducted By The County Boards Of Election Commissioners; And To Amend The Law Concerning Designation Of Wards In Municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 3 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-20 | Senate | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Returned to the Committee, with the recommendaation that it Do Pass. Amendment #1. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Filed |