AR SB451 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Notification that SB451 is now Act 644
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Notification that SB451 is now Act 644
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Requirements Regarding Visual Art, Music, And Performing Arts Requirements For Students In Grades Five (5) And Six (6) Enrolled In Public Schools That Are Not Configured As Elementary Schools.
Title
To Amend The Requirements Regarding Visual Art, Music, And Performing Arts Requirements For Students In Grades Five (5) And Six (6) Enrolled In Public Schools That Are Not Configured As Elementary Schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] | Rep. Bruce Cozart [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Notification that SB451 is now Act 644 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-11 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Filed |