AR SB449 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Notification that SB449 is now Act 809
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code With Respect To The Composition Of The Safe Schools Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code With Respect To The Composition Of The Safe Schools Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateNotification that SB449 is now Act 809
2019-04-04SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-04SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-03SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-03SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-04-03HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-04-03HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-02HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-28HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-28HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-28SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-27SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-27SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-27SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback